U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01124
  • Case Name: Shaw et al v. Norman City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • July 08, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 22, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 24, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.