U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01129
  • Case Name: Jones v. Howard-Ha Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 30, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.