U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01127
  • Case Name: Tarkington v. Harding
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 31, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Receipt]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 29, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • November 29, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • November 29, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.