U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01130
  • Case Name: American Federation of Government Employees Local 2586 et al v. Biden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 01, 2022: [Surreply]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 01, 2022: [Objections]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 23, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 02, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.