U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01128
  • Case Name: VunCannon v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Objections]
  • February 17, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 27, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 30, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • November 30, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.