U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01131
  • Case Name: Herrion v. Oklahoma State Treasurer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.