U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00501
  • Case Name: Jenkins et al v. CACI Inc - Federal
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 24, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 23, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • December 30, 2022: [Compel]
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 28, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 22, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • December 20, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 13, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 11, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Special Report]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Special Report]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • June 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 22, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • May 24, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.