U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01132
  • Case Name: Lejeune v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Verdict]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibit]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • January 11, 2023: [Supplement]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 09, 2023: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • January 06, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Final Contentions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Docket Call]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 12, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • December 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 12, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Docket]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 03, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 06, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • August 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Certification of Issue to State Court]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.