U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-00355
  • Case Name: Cain v. Mays Housecall Home Health Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.