U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01133
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Duroy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Receipt]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice from the Court]
  • October 10, 2024: [Application for Writ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Compel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Case Stayed]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • January 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 08, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.