U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-01235
  • Case Name: CTC Inc v. Schneider National Carriers Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 01, 2022: [Final Contentions]
  • February 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Objections]
  • January 27, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • January 18, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • January 18, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 18, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sanctions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.