U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01136
  • Case Name: Oklahoma State of et al v. Biden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • December 27, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 20, 2021: [Declaration]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2021: [Declaration]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • December 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • December 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 03, 2021: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 03, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.