U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01135
  • Case Name: Sarno v. Sewell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Leave]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 10, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • February 10, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 08, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • February 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2022: [Default Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • December 09, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.