U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01138
  • Case Name: ASI Construction LLC v. Oklahoma City City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 22, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 18, 2025: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • April 16, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 14, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 08, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 08, 2025: [Witness List]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 17, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 09, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 26, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.