U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01134
  • Case Name: Robertson v. The United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • July 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 29, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 26, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 03, 2021: [Leave]
  • December 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.