U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01157
  • Case Name: Owens v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.