U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01165
  • Case Name: Menaker v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • May 09, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 09, 2022: [Remand]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 09, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.