U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01159
  • Case Name: Yarclay v. Micieli
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • January 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 09, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • December 09, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 09, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.