U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01166
  • Case Name: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Battreall et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 19, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • April 15, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 24, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.