U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01169
  • Case Name: Bowie et al v. Phoenix Financial Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 24, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • January 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • January 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.