U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01171
  • Case Name: Lottie et al v. Midland Credir Management Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.