U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01170
  • Case Name: Matthews et al v. Credit Collection Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Intervene]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2021: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • December 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.