U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01168
  • Case Name: Parker v. Crow et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Receipt]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Receipt]
  • July 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 28, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Leave]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 27, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 06, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Objections]
  • December 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 10, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • December 10, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.