U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00999
  • Case Name: Redfearn v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • May 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 21, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Response to Non - Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.