U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01174
  • Case Name: Shamsher Shahabuddin LLC v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.