U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01175
  • Case Name: Petty v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • January 07, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 14, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • December 14, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.