U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01173
  • Case Name: Clark v. Dewey County Oklahoma
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 07, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 26, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 26, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Compel]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.