U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01182
  • Case Name: Foreman Electric Services Inc v. Mammoth Energy Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2022: [Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 04, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • January 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Related or Companion Case]
  • December 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.