U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01181
  • Case Name: Shaw v. Brewer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 08, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 05, 2022: [Special Report]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 11, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 09, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 02, 2022: [Receipt]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • December 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.