U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01180
  • Case Name: Carvallido v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • October 04, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • July 05, 2022: [Remand]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 25, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • March 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • February 09, 2022: [Substitute Party]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to Non-party]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.