U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01185
  • Case Name: Nolte v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 22, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 08, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 10, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • December 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 17, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.