U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01184
  • Case Name: Galloway v. Wal Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket]
  • February 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • December 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 17, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • December 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.