U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01188
  • Case Name: Davis v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
  • June 07, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • June 06, 2022: [Remand]
  • June 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 25, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 25, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 25, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 23, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • February 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.