U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01187
  • Case Name: Ellis v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • February 23, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • February 10, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 17, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • December 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.