U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00955
  • Case Name: Phillips v. Rodgers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • June 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 03, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Objections]
  • April 13, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 13, 2022: [Objections]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 18, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Strike]
  • February 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • February 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Strike]
  • February 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Reply]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.