U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01192
  • Case Name: Ainsworth v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • June 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • March 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 23, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 23, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 22, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.