U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01191
  • Case Name: Meehan v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • August 04, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 22, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.