U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01193
  • Case Name: Winterhalter v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 01, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 23, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • December 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.