U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01195
  • Case Name: Custard v. Bowen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order for Response]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 23, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • December 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.