U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01198
  • Case Name: Warrior v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 11, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 07, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • March 23, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 27, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 27, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.