U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01197
  • Case Name: Passion Church Inc v. North Star Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • October 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 26, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 03, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • December 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.