U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01200
  • Case Name: Walker et al v. MAVRC Pizza LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.