U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01203
  • Case Name: Shaw et al v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 24, 2022: [Certificate of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Receipt]
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.