U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Standard Nutrition Company et al v. Reed
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • September 01, 2022: [Strike]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.