U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Dotson et al v. IC Systems Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 11, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • May 11, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 01, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • February 25, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • January 05, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.