U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Soares v. Varner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 05, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 10, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • February 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 05, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.