U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Schneider et al v. Custom Truck One Source LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 10, 2022: [Settlement]
  • November 10, 2022: [Expedite]
  • November 10, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Enforce]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 01, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 27, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 20, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 15, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 14, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2022: [Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • July 13, 2022: [Compel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 31, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 31, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • January 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 07, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • January 05, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.