U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Myers v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 06, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.