U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Smiley v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 06, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 06, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.