U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al v. Jake S Aldridge PC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 03, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.